skip to content

Cummings, Theresa Kasumi Eva

CPSO#: 95993

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

330 Hwy 7 E
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B3P8
Canada
Phone: 905-707-5007
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Theresa Cummings Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cummings ( CPSO# 95993 )

Business Address:
4-490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 898-2519

Business Address:
201-235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
510-330 Hwy #7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THERESA KASUMI EVA CUMMINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CUMMINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017