skip to content

Cullingham, Kyle James Gerald

CPSO#: 99733

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 31 Dec 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Elective Trainee - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2013