skip to content

Culic, Cherie Ann

CPSO#: 91597

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 CF Health Services
Department of National Defense
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone: 705-424-1200 Ext. 2409 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cherie Culic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Culic ( CPSO# 91597 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's General Hospital
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2
Phone Number: (705) 848-7181

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHERIE ANN CULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013