skip to content

Cubillos Salcedo, Javier Enrique

CPSO#: 93746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Sep 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Colombia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Sep 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 05 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 06 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Oct 2018 to 31 Aug 2019
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 11 Jun 2022
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2021 Active
 1.    Dr. Javier Enrique Cubillos Salcedo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western Ontario,
                        in  which Dr. Cubillos Salcedo holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Cubillos  Salcedo  no  longer  holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the   College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr.  Cubillos
                        Salcedo's   clinical   performance,   knowledge,  skill,  judgment,
                        professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does not receive an annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee  makes  a  decision about Dr. Cubillos Salcedo's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2019, and expires on June 30, 2022. Upon renewal of Dr. Cubillos Salcedo's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.