skip to content

Luchkiw, Crystal S.

CPSO#: 97606

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 17 Mar 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Feb 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Luchkiw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  October 22, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On November 18, 2021, Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre notified the College, pursuant to section 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and section 85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that Dr. Luchkiw resigned her medical staff appointment at the hospital on October 22, 2021, during the course of an investigation by the hospital into allegations related to Dr. Luchkiw’s practice and conduct and in connection with Dr. Luchkiw’s non-compliance with hospital policy.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2014 to 29 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2014
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2022
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 17 Mar 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Jul 2023
Summary:

On July 6, 2023, the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found that Dr. Luchkiw engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, failed to respond appropriately or within a reasonable period of time to a written inquiry from the College and failed to cooperate with its investigations into her conduct, communications and infection control practices in relation to COVID-19.

The Tribunal also found that Dr. Luchkiw contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration by breaching the terms of an interim order made under s. 25.4 of the Code.

The Tribunal Office will schedule a penalty hearing.  

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Case Management: 2022-10-21; Motions: 2022-09-07, 2022-11-23, 2023-03-10; Merits: 2023-05-17 and 19; Penalty: 2023-11-28