skip to content

Cruz Pereira, Oscar Octavio

CPSO#: 90116

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2009 to 25 Jan 2009
EL - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Jan 2009 to 06 Feb 2009
EL - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014