skip to content

Crummey, James Macdonald

CPSO#: 29505

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
06 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Not In Practice

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J.M. Crummey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Crummey ( CPSO# 29505 )

Business Address:
Mount Dennis Weston Health Centre
2050 Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9X 1X4
Phone Number: (416) 763-1171

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Matthew Narine, Mount Dennis Weston Health Center, 2050 Weston Road, Toronto M9N 1X4
Date Received: 05 May 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 May 2022