skip to content

Cruickshank, Matthew Jon

CPSO#: 95320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
1874 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H2
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-3079 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Magenta Health
625 Queen Street East, Suite 108
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Canada
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-3079
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew Cruickshank Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cruickshank ( CPSO# 95320 )

Business Address:
1874 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1H2
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Business Address:
Suite 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JON CRUICKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUICKSHANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2013