skip to content

Cruce, Roxana

CPSO#: 90103

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Fac De Medicina Generala Din Craiova, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2009 to 29 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2009 to 29 Mar 2010
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2010 to 12 Mar 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 13 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2015