skip to content

Crossman, Roberta Lindsay

CPSO#: 97768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
True North Medical Centre
24 Dalhousie Street 2nd Floor
Toronto On
M5B 2A5
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5
Phone: 1-888-878-3563
Fax: (416) 981-8939 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Roberta Crossman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Crossman ( CPSO# 97768 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
24 Dalhousie Street
Toronto ON  M5B 2A5
Phone Number: (888) 878-3563


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERTA LINDSAY CROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014