skip to content

Crosby, David Ross Gordon

CPSO#: 22330

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Jul 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2007