skip to content

Crookshank, Emily Dawn

CPSO#: 86334

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E.D. Crookshank Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Crookshank ( CPSO# 86334 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY DAWN CROOKSHANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROOKSHANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2011 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2012