skip to content

Crombeen, Allison Marie

CPSO#: 95093

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospice PC Clinic
Suite 4
460 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4
Phone: (519) 337-3848
Fax: (519) 491-5803 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allison M. Crombeen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crombeen ( CPSO# 95093 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospice
4 - 460 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W4
Phone Number: (519) 337-3848

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospice
140 Water Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 337-0537

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Palliative Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON MARIE CROMBEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROMBEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2013