skip to content

Croitoru, David Oliver

CPSO#: 112894

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2022 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID OLIVER CROITORU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROITORU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022