skip to content

Croft, Benjamin Gordon

CPSO#: 84617

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Family Health Centre
200 James St. South
Suite 204
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone: (905) 526-1606
Fax: (905) 526-7692 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre de Santé Communautaire de
Hamilton / Niagara
1320 Barton St. East
Hamilton ON  L8H 2W1
Canada
Phone: (905) 528-0163
Fax: (905) 528-9001
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. G. Croft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Croft ( CPSO# 84617 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Southwest Family Health Centre
200 James St. South
Suite 204
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (905) 526-1606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN GORDON CROFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008