skip to content

Cristian, Alexandra Laura

CPSO#: 98143

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
371 Front St West
PMB #150
Toronto ON  M5V 3S8
Phone: (416) 792-9196
Fax: (416) 792-9196 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A.L. Cristian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cristian ( CPSO# 98143 )

Business Address:
371 Front Street West
PMB #150
Toronto ON  M5V 3S8

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Adult Mental Health Unit
100 Queen Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA LAURA CRISTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017