skip to content

Cripps, Mary Christine

CPSO#: 29413

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christine Cripps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cripps ( CPSO# 29413 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Box #913
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Regional Cancer Center General Campus Box 913 501 Smyth Rd Ottawa, Ontario K1H 8L6
Date Received: 12 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020