skip to content

Crespin, Marcelo Orlando

CPSO#: 101268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232 Electoral District: 06

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 03 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 03 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 04 Apr 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2018 Active
             Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.  Marcelo  Orlando  Crespin shall practise medicine as required by the
                  postgraduate medical education  program  in which Dr. Crespin is enrolled
                  at Queen's University.

            (2)   In Dr. Crespin's practice in the postgraduate  medical education program,
                  Dr. Crespin shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated  with the department
                  where   Dr.  Crespin  is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to   which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Crespin's  practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Crespin shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Crespin may practise  psychiatry  and to the extent of his employment
                  at  Ontario  Shores  Centre for Mental Health,  while  under  supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Crespin's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Crespin may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. Crespin  must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Crespin is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when Dr.  Crespin  no  longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent
                        resident  status, or a valid  employment  authorization  under  the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate   automatically  converts  to  a  regular  Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.   Crespin  must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor  identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of
                        any concerns regarding  Dr.  Crespin's  practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding  knowledge,   skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Crespin's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Crespin  to  engage  in  practice outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Crespin's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if  Dr. Crespin takes a leave of absence, or transfers  to  another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education  program  specified in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the   event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate  Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Crespin  may  not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program  under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Crespin applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  October  1, 2018.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph  6(a), this certificate of registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2019.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice  outside   the   postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.