skip to content

Creek, Kristen Lee Breanne

CPSO#: 93612

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kristen Creek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: East Liberty Medical Centre 901 King Street West Toronto ON M5V 3H5
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016


Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc. 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 416-781-9083 / 1-888-781-9083 ext. 120 Fax: 1-888-297-9338
Date Received: 07 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 2016