skip to content

Crawford, Eric John

CPSO#: 98102

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2020
EXPIRY DATE
25 Aug 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Armour Blvd
North York ON  M5M 3B9
Canada
Phone: 4165771482
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:26 Aug 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Eric  John Crawford may practise orthopedic surgery with the Toronto
                  Western Hospital in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Crawford's eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Crawford's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to  the  College  by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Crawford's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 26, 2020,  and  will  expire  on  or
                  before August 25, 2023, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.