skip to content

Crawford, Eric John

CPSO#: 98102

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Aug 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021