skip to content

Cranford, Vanessa Lynn

CPSO#: 92480

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 28 Feb 2010
EL - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 2015