Crane, Jordan David Thomas (CPSO#: 91775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2010

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 876-4549
Fax: (705) 740-0996
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Crane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Crane ( CPSO# 91775 )

Business Address:
302 - 270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 876-4549

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN DAVID THOMAS CRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 01, 2019, Dr. Crane has completed all the requirements of his SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)