skip to content

Cramarossa, Gemma Rosalba

CPSO#: 112131

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Rutherford Road
Unit 103
Vaughan ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: 416 849 2250
Fax: 416 849 2252 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:30 Jun 2022 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEMMA ROSALBA CRAMAROSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAMAROSSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021