skip to content

Craigie, Elizabeth

CPSO#: 25290

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jul 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1984