skip to content

Craig, Michael Brian

CPSO#: 95276

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone: (519) 666-1610
Fax: (519) 666-0281 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael B. Craig Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Craig ( CPSO# 95276 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 433-4999

Business Address:
36 Heritage Drive
Ilderton ON  N0M 2A0
Phone Number: (519) 666-1610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRIAN CRAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013