Craig, John Campbell (CPSO#: 32717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Feb 2019

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone: (519) 669-5493
Fax: (519) 669-5901
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Craig Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 32717 )

Business Address:
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493


Corporation Name: Drs. Craig, Norris, Jones, Onuska and Schwindt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Onuska ( CPSO# 59693 )
Dr. I. Norris ( CPSO# 52498 )
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 55549 )
Dr. J. Craig ( CPSO# 32717 )
Dr. J. Schwindt ( CPSO# 102110)

Business Address:
2 Park Avenue West
Elmira ON  N3B 1L1
Phone Number: (519) 669-5493

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 11 Feb 2019 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 11, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Campbell Craig,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Craig to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOHN CAMPBELL CRAIG
                                          ("Dr. Craig)
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Craig, certificate of registration number 32717, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that following receipt of a public complaint
                  that raised concerns about my standard of practice as a general
                  practitioner, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number
                  1104379 (the "Investigation").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Craig, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Craig, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   The University of Toronto's Medical Record Keeping course;
                  
                        (ii)  A review and written summary of literature related to the
                              appropriate prescribing and deprescribing of benzodiazepines;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) A review and written summary of the College's Medical Records
                              policy.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Craig, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Craig, undertake to complete this requirement within four
                        (4) months of the date of this Undertaking, or, if no satisfactory
                        program is available by that time, by the first possible
                        opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Craig, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.


            (10)  I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted following a public
                              complaint into Dr. Craig's practice as a general
                              practitioner. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Craig will engage in professional education in
                                    benzodiazepine prescribing and medical record-keeping.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Craig, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Craig, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Craig, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Craig, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Campbell Craig to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 11, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted following a public complaint into Dr. Craig’s practice as a general practitioner. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Craig will engage in professional education in benzodiazepine prescribing and medical record-keeping.