skip to content

Crabbe, Rory Adam

CPSO#: 98049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 4N7
Phone: (519) 432-6786
Fax: (519) 432-3292 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rory Crabbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Crabbe ( CPSO# 98049 )

Business Address:
Oxford Medical Centre
312 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 4N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-6786

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RORY ADAM CRABBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRABBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2014