skip to content

Cozens, Karen Louise

CPSO#: 95910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
Suite 302
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 740-6871 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J7C3
Canada
Phone: 705-743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Cozens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cozens ( CPSO# 95910 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 740-6871

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE COZENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COZENS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015