skip to content

Coyne, Jade Brittany Rita

CPSO#: 95466

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
435 The Boardwalk, Medical Center 2
Cardiopulmonary Services
Suite 302
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C2
Phone: (519) 741-5252 Ext. 220
Fax: (519) 741-5772 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Region of Waterloo Public Health
99 Regina Street South
Waterloo ON  N2J4V3
Canada
Phone: 5195754400
Fax: 5198832248
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Louise Marshall Hospital
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Canada
Phone: (519) 323-2210
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:06 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JADE BRITTANY RITA COYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Oct 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2015