skip to content

Cox, John Osborne

CPSO#: 23881

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Apr 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. O. Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 2055 Huron Church Road Windsor, ON N9C 2L4
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015