skip to content

Cox, Heather Lynette

CPSO#: 88634

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Arts Building
Suite 202
270 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-6760
Fax: (705) 743-9912 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Heather L. Cox Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:17 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER LYNETTE COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2016