skip to content

Cowger, Jeffery John Michael

CPSO#: 95642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
Suite 204
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone: (519) 873-1447
Fax: (519) 873-1448 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Cowger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cowger ( CPSO# 95642 )

Business Address:
Skin Therapy Centre
Advanced Medical Group
204 - 230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 873-1447

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFERY JOHN MICHAEL COWGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016