skip to content

Covelli, Andrea Marie

CPSO#: 86821

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Siani Hospital
Division of Surgery
1266- 600 Univeristy Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone: (416) 5865163
Fax: 4165868847 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARIE COVELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COVELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017