skip to content

Coulter, Corinne Anne Marie

CPSO#: 100728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
Main Building
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Coulter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coulter ( CPSO# 100728)

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
550 Wellington Road
Main Building
C3-103
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CORINNE ANNE MARIE COULTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COULTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2016