skip to content

Coulson, David Bigelow

CPSO#: 15424

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Port Arthur Health Centre 194 Court Street North Thunder Bay, ON P7A 4V7
Date Received: 14 Jul 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1955
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014