skip to content

Costescu, Dustin James Whitby

CPSO#: 86495

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Non-Binary

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
H S C Room 2F 45
1200 Main Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: (905) 577-0471 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

M-410
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 574-8606
Fax: (905) 381-7035
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Costescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Costescu ( CPSO# 86495 )

Business Address:
711 Concesssion Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 574-8606

Business Address:
McMaster University
HSC Room 2F 45
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:11 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUSTIN JAMES WHITBY COSTESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 11 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 12 Sep 2011 to 11 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 12 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Aug 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012