skip to content

Costantini, Daniela Frances

CPSO#: 92867

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Villani, Daniela Frances (used until: 15 May 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, 3rd floor,
suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Costantini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Costantini ( CPSO# 92867 )
Dr. D. Costantini ( CPSO# 101016)

Business Address:
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (289) 269-1522

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners
Diagnostic Imaging
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813 1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELA FRANCES COSTANTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTANTINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014