skip to content

Costa, Giuseppe

CPSO#: 86293

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone: 905-883-6614
Fax: 905-883-6904 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Toronto Clinic
Suite 2000, East Tower
55 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Canada
Phone: 416-849-5555
Fax: 416-849-5551
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Oak Ridges Fracture Clinic
Suite 100
13291 Yong Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: 905-773-7759 Ext. x2380
Fax: 905-773-1325
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 9058831212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Giuseppe Costa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Costa ( CPSO# 86293 )

Business Address:
9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: 9058836614

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:09 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2016