skip to content

Cossar, Kathryn Elizabeth

CPSO#: 98148

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
640 Ross Avenue
Suite B
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone: (705) 268-0660
Fax: (705) 268-0964 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kathryn E. Cossar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cossar ( CPSO# 98148 )

Business Address:
B - 640 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 0A2
Phone Number: (705) 268-0660

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-2131

Business Address:
Hopital Notre Dame
1405 Edward Street
Hearst ON  P0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 362-4291

Business Address:
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ELIZABETH COSSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017