skip to content

Cosmin, Nicoleta Delia

CPSO#: 87043

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
Georgina Family Medical Centre
417 Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone: (905) 989-7800
Fax: (905) 535-7800 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-8755
Fax: (905) 237-8756
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicoleta Cosmin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cosmin ( CPSO# 87043 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
Georgina Family Medical Centre
417 The Queensway South
Keswick ON  L4P 2C7
Phone Number: (905) 989-7800

Business Address:
Richmond Hill Medical Clinic
10243 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B2
Phone Number: (905) 237-8755

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLETA DELIA COSMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009