skip to content

Cortel-LeBlanc, Andree-Michelle

CPSO#: 100575

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: LeBlanc, Andree-Michelle (used until: 21 Nov 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343 Booth St
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 17 Dec 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREE-MICHELLE CORTEL-LEBLANC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTEL-LEBLANC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018