skip to content

Corriveau, Sophie Lynne

CPSO#: 95465

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 405- McMaster Clinics
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905)521-2100 Ext. 44548
Fax: (365)317-6267 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sophie Lynne Corriveau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Corriveau ( CPSO# 95465 )

Business Address:
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:17 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SOPHIE LYNNE CORRIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Jul 2018
CF - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015