skip to content

Corriveau, Nathalie

CPSO#: 97584

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 47210 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Corriveau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Corriveau ( CPSO# 97584 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: 705-728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHALIE CORRIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIVEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017