skip to content

Corrigan, Michael James

CPSO#: 31653

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael J. Corrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2021