skip to content

Corrigan, Linde

CPSO#: 93544

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone: (613) 687-7641
Fax: 613 687 6808 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDE CORRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2013 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2014