skip to content

Correia, Caroline Elizabeth

CPSO#: 95943

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
Suite 104
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Correia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Correia ( CPSO# 95943 )

Business Address:
Hunstville Professional Building
Suite 104
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CAROLINE ELIZABETH CORREIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014