skip to content

Correa-Bulnes, Raimundo

CPSO#: 92001

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Aug 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011