skip to content

Corrales Medina, Vicente Francisco

CPSO#: 92086

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Sep 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Catolica de Santa Maria, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
ASB Rm 2-003
Ottawa ON  K1V 8Z7
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10297
Fax: (613) 761-4456 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vicente Corrales-Medina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Corrales Medina ( CPSO# 92086 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4R9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective:15 Dec 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2016 Active
             Dr.  Vicente  Francisco  Corrales Medina may practise medicine independently in
            infectious diseases.