skip to content

Corpus, Rolando Tojino

CPSO#: 31415

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4580 Dufferin Street
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y2
Phone: (416) 739-9123
Fax: (416) 739-1238 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

279 Kingston E
Suite 18
Ajax ON  L1Z 0K5
Canada
Phone: 905 239 2403
Fax: 905 239 2040
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROLANDO TOJINO CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1980